Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Trevino, Marcus M., The United States Of America, American General Financial Services Inc, represented by Donna K. Webb, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 673792 Vol./Book 673792 |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Other | |
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 07, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Served 06/17/2009 | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES INC Served 06/16/2009 | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.