Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, Millsap Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Walls, Tie-Stone Retaining, Galier, Victor, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 512861 Vol./Book 512861 |
|
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
December 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation WALLS, TIE-STONE RETAINING Served 12/24/2008 | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation GALIER, VICTOR Returned Unserved 01/08/2009 Returned 01/08/2009 | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | File | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.