Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Sanders, Victor Allen, Sanders, R.L., Sanders, Curtiss Lindell, Sanders, Billy Carl, Robinson, Virginia Leah Sanders, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQuisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Information
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Information
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
April 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Information
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
$Disp
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
June 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 621012 Vol./Book 621012 Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation SANDERS, R.L. Unserved
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 539304 Vol./Book 539304 Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: ROBINSON, VIRGINIA LEAH SANDERS Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.