Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Service District #06, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Mcquerns, Robert Lee, Mcquerns, Quida, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 531785 Vol./Book 531785 |
|
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation MCQUERNS, ROBERT LEE Served 01/12/2009 | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation MCQUERNS, QUIDA Returned Unserved 03/02/2009 Returned 03/02/2009 | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | File | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.