Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Johnson, Mary Elizabeth, Bojak, Poulo John, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2008 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Letter | |
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.