Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Independent School District, Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Price, Duayne D, Price, Cheryl A, Harris, Joe, Sr., represented by Dennis M. Morrow, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Partial Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
December 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 671386 Vol./Book 671386 Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Transmittal
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
December 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
$Disp
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
November 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 571513 Vol./Book 571513 Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition:Party: PRICE, DUAYNE D Disposition: NOTICE OF PARTIAL NON-SUIT Reporter: Glenna Windell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.