Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Millsap Independent School District, Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Smith, Lonnie D, Mcgraw, Jack B, Delay, Lucky, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeQuisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2008 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Plaintiff |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 621814 Vol./Book 621814 Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
June 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
$Disp
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Citation MCGRAW, JACK B Served 05/12/2009
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation DELAY, LUCKY Served 01/05/2009
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
|
December 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation SMITH, LONNIE D Returned Unserved 02/23/2009 Returned 02/23/2009
Judge: Quisenberry, Graham Converted Disposition:Party: SMITH, LONNIE D Disposition: DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF Reporter: Sharon Mims |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.