Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rather, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dwain Dent, against Hamilton, Loyd, Federal Insurance Company, represented by Malcolm G Renwick, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Chrestman, Don presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChrestman, Don Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 665183 Vol./Book 665183 Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
$Disp
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
September 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
August 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
August 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
June 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
JY (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don)
Judge: Chrestman, Don Converted Disposition: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.