Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Robinson, Britney Lynne, Dobbs, Robert Douglas, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryPaternity - Iv-D |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
April 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
March 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ | |
June 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
April 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 207, Page 259-272 Vol./Book 207, Page 259-272 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.