Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, Brock Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Lusk, Taran, Lusk, Mark, Dalton, Donna, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 565682 Vol./Book 565682 |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
September 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Amended Petition | |
September 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
August 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation LUSK, MARK Returned Unserved 09/12/2008 Returned 09/12/2008 | |
August 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Citation LUSK, TARAN Returned Unserved 09/12/2008 Returned 09/12/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.