Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, Garner Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Services, Ford Housing, Manley, W.T., Holder, Norman, Goodwin, Dorinda, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 13, Page 381 Vol./Book 13, Page 381 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation HOLDER, NORMAN Returned Unserved 01/22/2008 Returned 01/22/2008 | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation GOODWIN, DORINDA Served 01/04/2008 | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation SERVICES, FORD HOUSING Served 01/10/2008 Returned 01/10/2008 | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation MANLEY, W.T. Served 01/04/2008 | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.