Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Peaster Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Country Palace Grocery And Restaurant, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2007 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 15, Page 160-163 Vol./Book 15, Page 160-163 |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation COUNTRY PALACE GROCERY AND RESTAURANT Served 01/29/2008 | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | File | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA) | |
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.