Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Weatherford Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County, City Of Weatherford, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Leonard, Virginia A, Leonard, Jr Obie P., Leland, R.W. Dba, Hodges, Leland A, Anthony, James E, (total of 5) See All represented by E. Brad Mahon, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Don M. Chrestman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDon M. Chrestman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2006 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Sheriff'S Return On Tax Sale | |
February 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Exhibit Transmittal | |
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 14, Page 319-321 Vol./Book 14, Page 319-321 |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Chrestman, Don) Result: Held | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.