Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Weatherford Junior College District, Springtown Independent School District, Parker County Hospital District, Parker County Emergency Services District #01, Parker County, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Barbara M. Williams, against Lamance, Janet H.W., in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Non-Suit Pltf Vol./Book 13, Page 195 Vol./Book 13, Page 195 |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Held | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 12, Page 487 Vol./Book 12, Page 487 |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Firm Quote Of Fees | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.