Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Jeffrey Swain, against Reed, Michael Ray, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Cases Relating To Criminal Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | Agreement | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vol./Book 194, Page 450-451 Vol./Book 194, Page 450-451 |
|
April 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Certificate Of Written Discovery | |
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Citation REED, MICHAEL RAY Unserved | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | File | |
December 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.