Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Spaulding, Jim, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by David L. Paschall, against Pace, Fred, Pace, Clint, represented by J. Mac Rust, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts with Graham Quisenberry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGraham Quisenberry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2006 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
October 09, 2007 | Docket Event | JY (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) Result: Removed by Court | |
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 198, Page 147-149 Vol./Book 198, Page 147-149 |
|
September 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 197, Page 235 Vol./Book 197, Page 235 |
|
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Quisenberry, Graham) | |
August 23, 2007 | Docket Event | Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.