Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Office Of The Attorney General, filed a(n) General Family - Family case represented by Deborah A. Mckinney, against Melder, Gary Thomas, Melder, Angela Claire, in the jurisdiction of Parker County, TX, . Parker County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2007 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationParker County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ | |
July 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Bill Of Costs | |
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Information | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | $Disp | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Other | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 352, Page 265-273 Vol./Book 352, Page 265-273 |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.