Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Financial Alliance Leasing, Leasecomm Corp, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Mclallen, Douglas Dewitt, against El Delfin Sonriente, Lopez, Roberto, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with De Pena, Hector, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDe Pena, Hector, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 1999 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
June 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SHOW CAUSE (R): ROBERTO LOPEZ, JR. SERVED: Issue Date: 06/19/2001 |
|
June 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation SHOW CAUSE (R): ROBERTO LOPEZ, JR. SERVED: Issue Date: 06/19/2001 |
|
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE OF RESETTING OF CONTEMPT 41/713 |
|
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR ATTN REQ SERVICE/JAU |
|
April 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SHOW CAUSE (R): ROBERTO LOPEZ, JR. SERVED: Issue Date: 04/17/2001 |
|
April 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation SHOW CAUSE (R): ROBERTO LOPEZ, JR. SERVED: Issue Date: 04/17/2001 |
|
April 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 39/958-959 |
|
January 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR CONTEMPT: LEASECOMM CORP. Issue Date: 01/26/2001 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.