Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Watt, Shalyn, Watt, Becky, Watt, William J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cortez, Rudy, against Kureska, Debra, Kureska, Keith, represented by Martinez, Patrick M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 1999 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order - Agreed Order of Dismissal CV 24/PG 322-323 |
|
June 14, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTED /I |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FROM WM WATT REQ TAX REFUND/MB |
|
April 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM WILLIAM WATT RE TRUST/RC |
|
April 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTED (I) |
|
April 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRWILLIAM WATT RE TRUST & TAX RETURN/RC |
|
December 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR WILLIAM J WATT RE; CHNG O ADDR/GG |
|
September 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR WILLIAM WATT RE; CHNG O ADDR/GG |
|
April 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F W/DRWL O FUNDS/RC |
|
March 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order on Request for Reimbursement CV 68/PG 635 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.