Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General Tx filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Huerta, Martha presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuerta, Martha Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 1999 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Z - Release of Child Support Lien | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order on Modification (Scanned) |
|
May 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion for Judge to Confer with Children./DB | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Original Answer /DB |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Counter Claim / Counter Petition /DB |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Service Request Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.