Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/ADMIN WRIT OF W/H: TEXAS, STATE OF Issue Date: 10/06/2008 |
|
September 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS/I |
|
September 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation AG/CAPIAS & COPY (NCS): JUAN MANUEL PEREZ SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/09/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 09/23/2004 File Date: 09/09/2005 |
|
September 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AG/CAPIAS & COPY (NCS): JUAN MANUEL PEREZ SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/09/2005 Served By: LARRY OLIVAREZ, SR. NCS Issue Date: 09/23/2004 File Date: 09/09/2005 |
|
September 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CPY O PYMNT AGRMNT F CRT CSTS |
|
September 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORD F ISSU O CAPIAS/I |
|
June 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTRN'D LTR |
|
June 08, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC/GG |
|
June 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR IV-D CRT RE RESET |
|
May 28, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.