Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Ida Y, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Lopez, Ernesto Gallardo, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) -ORD T APPR & SH CS |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - AG Case Closed | |
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) I/Nonsuit |
|
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Precept | |
September 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Letter From OAG -For Professional Civil Process |
|
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) --ORD T APPR & SH CS 9/29 @ 8/I |
|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Z - Letter | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC BY PCP PER OAG LTR |
|
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Citation PRECEPT (PU): ERNESTO GALLARDO LOPEZ SERVED: Issue Date: 06/30/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.