Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Westergren, Michael J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestergren, Michael J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ACCOUNTING OF PAYMENTS PURSUANT THERETO/GC |
|
September 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FIRST AMENDED MTN TO ENFORCE FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AND FOR |
|
August 04, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR T CT MGR [FAX]/GG |
|
April 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE OF SETTING (I) |
|
October 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: NOLA CHARLYNE ARTZER |
|
August 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE 388/989 |
|
August 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F RULE 106 SERVICE/GG |
|
July 16, 2003 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): CHARLA ARTZER SERVED: 10/07/2003 FILED: 10/13/2003 Issue Date: 07/16/2003 File Date: 10/13/2003 Service Date: 10/07/2003 | |
July 16, 2003 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): CHARLA ARTZER SERVED: 10/07/2003 FILED: 10/13/2003 Issue Date: 07/16/2003 File Date: 10/13/2003 Service Date: 10/07/2003 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.