Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Brown, Eric presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrown, Eric Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) MOTION TO MODIFY |
|
October 10, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TEMP ORDER IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP I |
|
September 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: JULIANNA W. WARD, F/K/A |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN4): JULIANNA W. WARD F/K/A SERVED: 08/28/2006 FILED: 09/06/2006 Served By: ROBERT SHERWOOD CN4 Issue Date: 08/23/2006 File Date: 09/06/2006 Service Date: 08/28/2006 | |
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN4): JULIANNA W. WARD F/K/A SERVED: 08/28/2006 FILED: 09/06/2006 Served By: ROBERT SHERWOOD CN4 Issue Date: 08/23/2006 File Date: 09/06/2006 Service Date: 08/28/2006 |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/SH |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING NO SERVICE/JAU |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY CASE INFO SHEET/JAU |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PETITION TO MODIFY: DALE D. BERRY Issue Date: 08/01/2006 |
|
August 01, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BVS FORM/JAU |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.