Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rodriguez, Luisa, Rodriguez, Vincent, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case against Manville Corp Asbestos Disease Comp Fund, U S Gypsum Corp, Porter, H K, Pittsburgh Corning Corp, Owens Illinois, Inc, (total of 18) See All in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hunter, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHunter, Jack Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 27, 1987 |
CategoryProduct Liability - Asbestos/Silica |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
September 28, 1995 | Docket Event |
09/28/1995 Hearing (OCA) ORD TO DISM DEFT MANVILLE PERSONAL INJURY SET TRUST 211/859 |
|
September 27, 1995 | Docket Event |
09/27/1995 Case Event Conv MTN T DISMIS/LP |
|
August 30, 1994 | Docket Event |
08/30/1994 Hearing (OCA) ORD TO DISMM DEFT MANVILLE PERSONAL INJURY SET TRUSY CV194 P60 |
|
August 22, 1994 | Docket Event |
08/22/1994 Case Event Conv MTN TO DISMISS /AS |
|
August 04, 1992 | Docket Event |
08/04/1992 Hearing (OCA) ***TRUST CV160 P42 |
|
August 04, 1992 | Docket Event |
08/04/1992 Hearing (OCA) ORD T DISMISS AS T DEFT MANVILLE PERSONAL INJURY SETTLEMENT |
|
July 30, 1992 | Docket Event |
07/30/1992 Case Event Conv MTN T DISMISS/KW |
|
July 05, 1991 | Docket Event |
07/05/1991 Hearing (OCA) ORD ON MTN TO DISMISS ALL CROSS-DEFT ACANDS, INC. CV142 P91 |
|
July 05, 1991 | Docket Event |
07/05/1991 Hearing (OCA) ORD TO DISMISS DEFT ACANDS, INC, CV142 P90 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.