Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Nueces County Appraisal District's Original Answer Defendant Nueces County Appraisal District's Original Answer |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Nueces County Appraisal District Served 08/27/2021 Response Due 09/20/2021 Returned 08/31/2021 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Plaintiff'S Original Petition For Review Of Appraisal Review Board Order Plaintiff'S Original Petition For Review Of Appraisal Review Board Order |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.