Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:15 PM) () PLT's for MSJ (30 min) Result: Held PLT's for MSJ (30 min) |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Statement of the Evidence Statement of the Evidence |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Vacation Notice for Marvin L. Faires Vacation Notice for Marvin L. Faires |
|
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Publishers Affidavit Publishers Affidavit |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Return - OCA Publication Return of Service - OCA Publication Return of Service |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.