Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment of Judgment |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit Order Granting Notice of Non-Suit |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Suit |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Cover Letter Cover Letter | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - Raymundo Torres Return of Service - Raymundo Torres |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Torres, Raymundo Returned Unserved 09/10/2021 Returned 09/10/2021 | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Torres, Raymundo Unserved | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.