Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer and General Denial Defendant's Original Answer and General Denial |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - Rachel Ramos Return of Service - Rachel Ramos |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Ramos, Rachel Served 09/02/2021 Response Due 09/27/2021 Returned 09/03/2021 | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Ramos, Rachel Unserved | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.