Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment (9:00 AM) () Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 Settlement Agreement Rule 11 Settlement Agreement |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Entry of Judgment: 02/01/2023 9am Entry of Judgment: 02/01/2023 9am |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () Agreed Resolution |
|
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) Result: Reset | |
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) | |
November 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference | |
November 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.