Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMay 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Plaintiff's Appl. for Appointment of Post Judgment Receiver Result: Held Plaintiff's Appl. for Appointment of Post Judgment Receiver |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Plaintiff's Application for Appt. of Post Judgment Receiver - May 26, 2022 @ 130pm Plaintiff's Application for Appt. of Post Judgment Receiver - May 26, 2022 @ 130pm |
|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Amended Order Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to CPRC 31.002 (Limited Receivership) Amended Order Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to CPRC 31.002 (Limited Receivership) |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion To Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code Plaintiff's Motion To Appoint Post-Judgment Receiver Robert E. Jenkins Pursuant to Texas Civil Practice and Remedies Code |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver Order Appointing Post-Judgment Receiver |
|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for default judgment Motion Motion for default judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.