We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cvs As Lessee Vs. Nueces County Appraisal District

Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago ago

On August 11, 2021 a Civil Case - Other case was filed in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX.

Case Details

Filing Date

August 11, 2021

Last Refreshed

October 13, 2021

Filing Location

Nueces County, TX

Category

Civil Case - Other

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Original Answer
Docket Event Citation Nueces County Appraisal District Served 08/17/2021 Response Due 09/13/2021 Returned 08/18/2021
Docket Event Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Docket Event Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested
Service Requested
Docket Event Original Petition (OCA)
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.