Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - R L Petty Return of Service - R L Petty |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Petty, R L Unserved | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Petty, R L Served 08/26/2021 Response Due 09/20/2021 Returned 08/31/2021 | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Petty, R L Unserved | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Plaintiff S Original Petition Plaintiff S Original Petition |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.