Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedJune 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (2:15 PM) () PLT's Motion for Summary Judgment (1 hour and 2:15 PM) 06/01/2022 Reset by Court to 08/15/2022 PLT's Motion for Summary Judgment (1 hour and 2:15 PM) |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Agreed Resolution CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () Agreed Resolution |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference Agreed Resolution CANCELED Docket Control Conference (10:00 AM) () Agreed Resolution 06/15/2022 Reset by Court to 06/29/2022 |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) Agreed Resolution CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) Agreed Resolution |
|
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference (10:00 AM) () | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Agreed Resolution CANCELED Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) () Agreed Resolution Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Barnebey Law) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment (1:15 PM) () Final Judgment Final Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.