Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arango, Veronica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Salazar, Ronald J., against Constitution State Services Llc, Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, represented by Fancher, Rick, Nelson, Joelle G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Docket Call PRETRIAL CONF-3/11/24 @9AM, J.T. 3/12/24 @9AM |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Call PRETRIAL CONF 9/11/23@9AM, J.T. 9/12/23 @9AM @ 9AM |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Continuance (Signed) Trial Set March 12, 2024 |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's Third Amended Petition |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Motion For Continuance |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions - Multiple Parties | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Omnibus Motion to Set Objections and Motion to Compel Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company's Answers and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant Indian Harbor Insurance Company's Motion To Compel Plaintiff's Discovery Responses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.