Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wfc Limited Partnership, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Lippman, David, against Flores De Rocha, Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent Court's Own Motion and Notice of Hearing for Dismisssal of Want of Prosecution - December 11, 2023 @ 9:00 am |
|
October 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit non suit with prejudice |
|
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation - Gloria Flores De Rocha |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Flores De Rocha, Gloria Unserved | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.