Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Unredacted) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Unredacted) |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) Final Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) |
|
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Held | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Second Amended Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights Second Amended Notice of Hearing on Application for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Result: Other | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Order Approving Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Unredacted) Final Order Approving Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Unredacted) |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Order Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) Final Order Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Order Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) Final Order Transfer Of Structured Settlement Payment Rights (Redacted) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.