Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit (signed) Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order of Nonsuit (signed) |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Order of Nonsuit Order of Nonsuit |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Other CANCELED Application (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) Other for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Updated List of Dependents/ Redacted version of Exhibit 4 Updated List of Dependents/ Redacted version of Exhibit 4 |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Amended Notice of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Sale Of Partial Payment Rights Amended Notice of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Sale Of Partial Payment Rights |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application Other CANCELED Application (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) Other for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights (10 min) |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Watts, Sandra L.) for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights (10 min) for Approval of Sale of Partial Payment Rights (10 min) |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Sale Of Partial Payment Rights Notice of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Sale Of Partial Payment Rights |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.