Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Sandra L. Watts presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. Watts Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition Defendant Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP Return of Service Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP Served 07/27/2021 Response Due 08/23/2021 Returned 08/06/2021 | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Corpus Christi Retail Venture LP Unserved | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Plaintiff S Original Petition Plaintiff S Original Petition |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.