Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Notice of Nonsuit Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order on Notice of Nonsuit |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) App. Trans. Struct. Settle. Result: Other App. Trans. Struct. Settle. |
|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order On Notice Of Nonsui Order On Notice Of Nonsui |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice Of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Transfer, Notice Of Proposed Transfer Of Structured Annuity Payments, And Notice Of Deadline For Responses To Application Notice Of Hearing On Application For Approval Of Transfer, Notice Of Proposed Transfer Of Structured Annuity Payments, And Notice Of Deadline For Responses To Application |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application For Approval Of Transfer Of Structured Annuity Benefits Application Application For Approval Of Transfer Of Structured Annuity Benefits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.