Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Default Judgment (signed) Default Judgment (signed) |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service-Bret Worley Return of Service-Bret Worley |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Worley, Bret Mathew Served 07/22/2021 Response Due 08/16/2021 Returned 07/23/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Worley, Bret Mathew Unserved | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.