Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Affidavits & Records Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Affidavits & Records |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order Setting Hearing on Telephonic Docket Control Conference Order Setting Hearing on Telephonic Docket Control Conference |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - Open MRI of Corpus Christi (Radiology & Reports) Notice NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS - Open MRI of Corpus Christi (Radiology & Reports) |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Affidavits & Records Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Affidavits & Records |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Plaintiff's Discovery Exhibit Notice of Filing Plaintiff's Discovery Exhibit Notice of Filing |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Rule 11 - Withdraw Discovery Rule 11 - Withdraw Discovery |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement Rule 11 - Affidavits Rule 11 - Affidavits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.