Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) FRIENDLY SUIT FRIENDLY SUIT |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Final Judgment |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation Defendant's Designation of Lead Counsel Defendant's Designation of Lead Counsel |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Agreed Order To Proceed Without Guardian Ad Litem Agreed Order To Proceed Without Guardian Ad Litem |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Agreed Order to Proceed Without Guardian Ad Litem Agreed Order to Proceed Without Guardian Ad Litem |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letter to Clerk notifying of settlement Letter to Clerk notifying of settlement |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement of Minor Child Without Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Plaintiffs' Motion for Approval of Settlement of Minor Child Without Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem |
|
April 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants' Sworn Original Answer and Jury Demand Defendants' Sworn Original Answer and Jury Demand |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Declaratory Judgment Action Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Declaratory Judgment Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.