Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Default Judgment (Judicial Officer: Barclay, Susan ) Order of Default Judgment (signed) Order of Default Judgment (signed) |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Barclay, Susan) for Default Judgment Result: Held for Default Judgment |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Zoom Hearing Notice of Zoom Hearing |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Watts, Sandra L. ) Proposed Default Judgment Proposed Default Judgment |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation-Francisco Martinez Return of Service/Citation-Francisco Martinez |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Martinez, Francisco Served 03/16/2022 Response Due 04/11/2022 Returned 03/21/2022 | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Martinez, Francisco Unserved | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.