Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGalvan, Bobby Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal Notice Notice of Judgment and/or dismissal |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Default Judgment (signed) Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Granting Default Judgment (signed) |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Non-Military Status Affidavit Affidavit of Non-Military Status |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Motion Motion for Default Judgment |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Affidavit Affidavit of Service |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Granting Default Judgment Order Granting Default Judgment |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Garcia, Joshua A Served 06/22/2021 Response Due 07/19/2021 Returned 06/23/2021 | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Plaintiff S Original Petition And Notice Of Seizure And Intended Forfeiture Plaintiff S Original Petition And Notice Of Seizure And Intended Forfeiture |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.