Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Mary K. M. Medary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary K. M. Medary Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Defendant Union Leasing Trust's First Amended Answer, Request for Jury Trial and Requests for Disclosures to Plaintiff Defendant Union Leasing Trust's First Amended Answer, Request for Jury Trial and Requests for Disclosures to Plaintiff |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance of Counsel Notice Notice of Appearance of Counsel |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Jury Trial and Request for Disclosures Defendant's Original Answer and Request for Jury Trial and Request for Disclosures |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Union Leasing Trust Citation - Union Leasing Trust |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Union Leasing Trust Served 06/18/2021 Response Due 07/12/2021 Returned 06/21/2021 | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Plaintiff S Original Petition Rule 193.7 Notice And Requests For Disclosure Plaintiff S Original Petition Rule 193.7 Notice And Requests For Disclosure |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Attorney Cover Letter Attorney Cover Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.