Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) MTN. COMPEL MTN. COMPEL |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Passing Hearing Notice Notice of Passing Hearing |
|
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendants To Respond To Discovery Notice of Hearing On Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendants To Respond To Discovery |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant To Respond To Discovery Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant To Respond To Discovery |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendants To Respond to Discovery Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Defendants To Respond to Discovery |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants' Original Answer Defendants' Original Answer |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Greg Herrman Citation - Greg Herrman |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Herrman & Herrman, PLLC Citation - Herrman & Herrman, PLLC |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Herrman, Greg Served 06/18/2021 Response Due 07/12/2021 Returned 06/18/2021 Herrman & Herrman, PLLC Served 06/18/2021 Response Due 07/12/2021 Returned 06/18/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.