Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Craig, Steven R, Hunter, Susan Ellen Craig, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Dumas, David W, against Mrc Senior Living Corpus Christi, represented by Wallison, Ed, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) | |
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
November 24, 2023 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference | |
November 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Amendment of Pleadings | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Defendant | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.