Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Figelman, Jacob M, Peterson, Eric S., Turay, Janet B., against Rodriguez, Anna M, represented by Gonzalez, Hector Rene, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedMay 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order 05/15/2023 9am |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Continuance | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
January 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.