Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Nanette Hasette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNanette Hasette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Motion Motion for Entry of Default Judgment |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service Gabriel D Villafana Return of Service Gabriel D Villafana |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order on Substitution (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substituted Service |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Substitute Service in Support of Substitute Service |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service for Substitute Service |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Villafana, Gabriel D Served 07/29/2021 Response Due 08/23/2021 Returned 07/29/2021 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Villafana, Gabriel D Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.